U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 10, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • June 29, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • June 29, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • June 22, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • June 13, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 10, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 10, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 05, 2017: [Mail Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 23, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 19, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Request]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 07, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.