U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davies
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 18, 2018: [Forfeiture]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 17, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 15, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.