U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 26, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 10, 2017: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Request]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2016: [Request]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.