U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.