U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schroeder et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 25, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 31, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Request]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Request]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 16, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.