U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Antrim
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Passport - Return of]
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 14, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Furlough]
  • August 15, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • August 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2016: [Request]
  • August 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 02, 2016: [Request]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Consent]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Request]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.