U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Between Lodges
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 11, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 21, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 10, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Request]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.