U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Request]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.