U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dowty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 03, 2021: [Furlough]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 28, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 15, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 24, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 19, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • October 14, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 14, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Request]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.