U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crowe et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 06, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • January 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 19, 2016: [Furlough]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2016: [Consent]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Furlough]
  • September 14, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 18, 2016: [Furlough]
  • August 10, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.