U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sansberry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 23, 2017: [Quash]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • January 09, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • August 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2016: [Transport Defendant]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 08, 2016: [Request]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • July 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2016: [Transport Defendant]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.