U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05053
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Picardi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Proposed Schedule]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.