U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Featherman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.