U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-10018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mertins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 29, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 23, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.