U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-01029
  • Case Name: First State Bank of Roscoe et al v. Stabler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 30, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 26, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Appellants Reply Brief]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
  • September 15, 2016: [Appendix]
  • September 15, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 19, 2016: [Certificate]
  • August 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • August 03, 2016: [Bankruptcy Record]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 12, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet]
  • June 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 23, 2016: [Bankruptcy Docket Sheet]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.