U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 07, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 30, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 30, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 30, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • September 19, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 25, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 23, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 23, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.