U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newingham et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 08, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 07, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 05, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 04, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2016: [Arrest]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Text Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 13, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Request]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 27, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.