U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grimes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Response]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 20, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 02, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 25, 2021: [Leave to]
  • June 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Leave to]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 16, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 23, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2021: [Response]
  • March 17, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 16, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extend]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Supplement]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • January 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.