U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boswell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order for Return of Property]
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 26, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2016: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 21, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Request]
  • July 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2016: [Request]
  • July 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 28, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 28, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.