U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 14, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • June 05, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 24, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Furlough]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • February 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 22, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Request]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.