U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holbrooks et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 29, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 27, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 24, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 20, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • March 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 10, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • March 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 17, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2017: [Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 17, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 10, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Discovery]
  • November 14, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 07, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Suppress]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 06, 2016: [Request]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 05, 2016: [Request]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 01, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.