U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:97-cr-40091-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Pickering
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 02, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 21, 2017: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 22, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Psychiatric Report Received]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order for Psychiatric Examination]
  • September 27, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Psychiatric Report Received]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 26, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.