U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-10021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shillingstad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 10, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.