U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2021: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • April 11, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Response]
  • January 11, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • January 09, 2017: [Response]
  • January 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2017: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Request]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.