U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30062-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bad Warrior et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 18, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 19, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 01, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 19, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 21, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 24, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 23, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 08, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • September 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.