U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50069-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Blacksmith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 19, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 09, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 17, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Request]
  • July 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 06, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.