U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hulscher et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 21, 2022: [Response]
  • July 08, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 25, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 06, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • August 14, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 03, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 20, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 28, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 27, 2017: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • August 24, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 23, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 18, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • August 15, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 07, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 31, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 31, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 27, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 21, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 20, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 20, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 20, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 12, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [Mail Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 24, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 24, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 22, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 22, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • May 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 27, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 24, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • February 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2017: [Verdict]
  • February 24, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 24, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 23, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • February 23, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 23, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Jury List]
  • February 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 22, 2017: [Witness List]
  • February 21, 2017: [Strike ]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 21, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 17, 2017: [Response]
  • February 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 17, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 16, 2017: [Delivered]
  • February 16, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 15, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 15, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 14, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 09, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 07, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2017: [Suppress]
  • January 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • January 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • January 23, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Exclude]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 18, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 17, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • January 12, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 10, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 10, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 02, 2017: [Response]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 27, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 27, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 27, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 23, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 20, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 20, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Exclude]
  • December 20, 2016: [Jury List]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 19, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response]
  • December 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2016: [Receipt]
  • December 06, 2016: [Exclude]
  • December 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Joinder]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • September 06, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 10, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 05, 2016: [Discovery]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 29, 2016: [Request]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Response]
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2016: [Request]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 19, 2016: [Discovery]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response]
  • July 18, 2016: [Request]
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 15, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2016: [Request]
  • July 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 07, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.