U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 18, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 10, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Witness List]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 05, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 05, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 06, 2018: [Request]
  • December 06, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • December 05, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 03, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 29, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 19, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.