U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mireles-Rocha
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 07, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • September 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Request]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 12, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.