U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spath
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 24, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 24, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2022: [Request]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 02, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Return of Service]
  • March 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.