U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cournoyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 05, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 11, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 04, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 04, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Consent]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Request]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.