U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whyee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 09, 2016: [Discovery]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response]
  • August 18, 2016: [Request]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.