U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Shooter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2016: [Request]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2016: [Arrest]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.