U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kraft
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extend]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 02, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 02, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 02, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extend]
  • November 03, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 25, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 18, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 07, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 02, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Request]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.