U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 15, 2022: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Competency Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • September 01, 2021: [Produce ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • August 03, 2021: [Competency Evaluation]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 20, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 20, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2021: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 11, 2017: [Court Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2017: [Waiver]
  • October 04, 2017: [Trial Brief ]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Competency Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 08, 2016: [Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Response]
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Request]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 15, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.