U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. John
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.