U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warrior
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 10, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 02, 2016: [Consent]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.