U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Court Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Waiver]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 31, 2017: [Witness List]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Psychiatric Report Received]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 24, 2016: [Request]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Request]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.