U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 06, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Furlough]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Furlough]
  • April 12, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 29, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • March 25, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 18, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 28, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 28, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Request]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.