U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 31, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2016: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 16, 2016: [Request]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Request]
  • July 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.