U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thunder Shield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 12, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • July 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 05, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Suppress]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Suppress]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 05, 2016: [Request]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.