U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Earth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 03, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 13, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 27, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 26, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 26, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request]
  • July 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Request]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.