U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 12, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 18, 2016: [Extend]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 12, 2016: [Request]
  • August 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 08, 2016: [Request]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.