U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 07, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 28, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Extend]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 12, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 07, 2017: [Extend]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 18, 2016: [Furlough]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request]
  • July 26, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.