U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeLeon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • May 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • November 01, 2016: [Variance]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
  • October 24, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 28, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request]
  • July 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.