U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valandra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 20, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 24, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 04, 2019: [Release from Custody]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 27, 2018: [Furlough]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 20, 2018: [Furlough]
  • December 19, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 13, 2018: [Furlough]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2018: [Forfeiture]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • August 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Search & Seizure Warrant Issued]
  • April 11, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 03, 2017: [Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 17, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Request]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2016: [Arrest]
  • September 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Request]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.