U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Traversie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 14, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 13, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • November 01, 2016: [Variance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Request]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2016: [Request]
  • July 26, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.