U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arguello
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 24, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 31, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 30, 2017: [Furlough]
  • March 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 15, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • October 20, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 03, 2016: [Furlough]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • July 19, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.