U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lofton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 13, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extend]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 05, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Furlough]
  • April 30, 2021: [Release from Custody]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 24, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Sealed Order]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • July 02, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 05, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2019: [Forfeiture]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 14, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 10, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 30, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Response]
  • December 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Furlough]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 28, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 24, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 24, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 16, 2016: [Request]
  • August 13, 2016: [Request]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2016: [Request]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 03, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2016: [Request]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.