U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Chasing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 23, 2016: [Furlough]
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 25, 2016: [Request]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.